Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
West Michael, Mcguire Nancy, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kralovec Jambois & Schwar, against The Selfhelp Home,, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryMedical Mal-Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 23, 2020ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: May 07, 2020MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00REINSTATE CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: March 16, 2020CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: March 16, 2020MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER FILED
Date: June 02, 2020ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 29, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00MEDICAL MAL-PRACTICE COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 01, 2020APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: June 04, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: May 27, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 23, 2020EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.