Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lange Melinda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by O Connor Law Firm Ltd, against Alden Of Waterford L, Alden Gardens O F Wate, Alden Courts Of Water, represented by Rodriguez Adam M, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: March 17, 2020EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: June 11, 2020FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 24, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 23, 2020EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 20, 2020CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 23, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: June 11, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: March 17, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 20, 2020OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 19, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.