Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beals Claudia, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Smith Amundsen Llc, against Franklin Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryLibel/Slander |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: January 02, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: January 06, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: January 22, 2020LIBEL/SLANDER COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: December 31, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: January 06, 2020VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/LEAVE TO REFILE-ALLOWED
Date: March 04, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.