Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Taylor, Bean & Whitaker M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Broida & Nichele Ltd, against Andonov Ivan, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: March 03, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE FILED
Date: June 23, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: January 23, 2020DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 27, 2020CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: December 31, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: March 03, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: January 06, 2020MOTION TO VACATE - FILED
Date: March 03, 2020CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.