Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alanis Development Corpor, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mauer & Madoff Llc, against Centaur Construction Co.,, represented by Laurie & Brennan Llp, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: February 13, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 24, 2020AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: February 13, 2020EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: March 13, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 24, 2020CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 28, 2020AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 28, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 27, 2020CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: March 13, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.