Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Holownia Krystyna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Therman Charles N, against Paciora Adam, Paciora Simon, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury / Wrongful Death - Non Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: June 23, 2020Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: June 23, 2020Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: April 24, 2020Electronic Notice Sent
Date: April 24, 2020Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: March 25, 2020Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: March 25, 2020Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Other Personal Injury Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 24, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 23, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 24, 2020STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00VOLUNTARY MEDIATION WAS NOT UTILIZED IN REACHING THIS SETTLEMENT
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 23, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.