Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Benton, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kralovec Jambois & Schwar, against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc, American Academy Pain Med, American Geriatric Societ, Amerisource Bergen Drug C, (total of 18) See All represented by Gordon & Rees Llp, Tabet Divito & Rothstein, Tucker Ellis Llp, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: January 06, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: January 30, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: January 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: January 24, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: January 24, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: January 08, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: January 30, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: January 24, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: January 08, 2020PLACE ON BANKRUPTCY CALENDAR - ALLOWED -
Date: February 18, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.