Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ashley Michael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Corboy & Demetrio, against Aladdin Equipment Company, Ashbury Homeowners Associ, Halogen Supply Company, Mc Property Management Co, Swimming Pool Management, (total of 5) See All represented by Labarge Campbell &Lyon Ll, Litchfield Cavo Llp, Meachum Boyle & Trafman, Smith Amundsen Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: April 23, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 22, 2020CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: June 15, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 23, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 23, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: June 30, 2020ANSWER FILED
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 22, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: April 23, 2020ANSWER FILED
Date: April 10, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: April 23, 2020ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.