Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bugaj Alfreda, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Walczyk Sabina D, against Kanuru Rajesh, Kp Law, Llc, represented by Jahnke & Toolis Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Kathy M. Flanagan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Legal Malpractice Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Division
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Letter Filed
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Case Removed from Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice Of Deposition Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Close Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Comply - Continued -
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion To Vacate Non-Final Order/Judgment
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Extend Time - Continued -
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Extend Time - Continued -
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Denied -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Denied -
Date: November 30, 2022Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Extend Time - Continued -
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Close Discovery - Allowed -
Date: November 30, 2022Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: November 30, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: November 30, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Continuance
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Extend Time - Continued -
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: December 21, 2022Case Set On Status Call - Continued -
Date: December 21, 2022Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: November 30, 2022Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: March 09, 2023Case Set On Status Call
Date: March 09, 2023Voluntary Dismissal W/Leave To Refile-Allowed
Date: July 06, 2023Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00LEGAL MALPRACTICE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.