Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vazquez Ana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Serpico Petrosino Di Pier, against Hernandez Arturo, represented by Steven A Lihosit Law Offi, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John H. Ehrlich presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Mailed
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Request Filed
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: March 30, 2023Notice Of Filing Mailed
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: January 10, 2022Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Focused Case Management
Date: April 12, 2023Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Focused Case Management
Date: April 26, 2023Case Set On Assignment Call
Date: April 12, 2023Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: September 11, 2023Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: September 11, 2023Case Continued For Focused Case Management
Date: July 26, 2023Case Continued For Focused Case Management
Date: May 25, 2023Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: September 11, 2023ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING MAILED
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING MAILED
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00REQUEST FILED
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.