Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nagel Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Costello Mcmanon Burke &, against Singh Kanwar, represented by John H Currie Law Off, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Moira S. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: No Contact
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: July 15, 2019File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: October 07, 2019Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Routine Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: November 18, 2019Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: August 12, 2019Notice Filed
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Affidavit For Alias Summons Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: September 09, 2019Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 07, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: NO CONTACT
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: July 15, 2019ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: November 18, 2019ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: August 12, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR ALIAS SUMMONS FILED
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.