Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guzman Elizabeth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Robert J Shelist Pc, against Allied Security Service, Universal Protection Serv, Wal-Mart, Inc., represented by Ohagan Meyer Llc, Wilson Elser Moskowitz, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John H. Ehrlich presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury / Wrongful Death - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Other Personal Injury Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Request For Admission Of Facts Filed
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Strike From Motion Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Subpoena Filed
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice Of Deposition Filed
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Exclude Evidence, Testimony Or A Witness - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Motion For Good Faith Findings - Allowed
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: April 12, 2023Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Electronic Notice Sent
Date: March 30, 2023Response / Reply - Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Denied -
Date: July 14, 2021File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: April 12, 2023Brief Filed
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: July 14, 2021File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Voluntary Mediat. Was Not Utilized In Reach. This Settlement
Date: April 12, 2023Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: July 14, 2021ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH FINDINGS - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR A WITNESS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00VOLUNTARY MEDIATION WAS NOT UTILIZED IN REACHING THIS SETTLEMENT
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ADMISSION OF FACTS FILED
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.