Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Manning Melissa, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Langendorf Robert A, against Champion Kina, Gunn Glinda, Manage Chicago Inc, Manage Chicago Investment, Manage Chicago Restoratio, (total of 8) See All represented by Ripes Nelson Baggot Kalob, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryPremises Liabilty - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Default - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: February 11, 2020Transfer Case To Presiding Judge Within District/Division
Date: March 10, 2020Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: February 11, 2020Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: February 11, 2020Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Alias Summons Issued
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Order Case Transferred For Trial To Municipal Dept, 1st Dist
Date: March 12, 2020Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: February 11, 2020Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: February 11, 2020New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Premises Liability Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Summons Returned - N.S. Reason: Other Reason
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Default - Continued -
Date: February 11, 2020Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00ORDER CASE TRANSFERRED FOR TRIAL TO MUNICIPAL DEPARTMENT, 1ST DISTRICT
Date: March 12, 2020FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00TRANSFER CASE TO PRESIDING JUDGE WITHIN DISTRICT/DIVISION
Date: March 10, 2020DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00SUMMONS RETURNED - N.S. REASON: OTHER REASON
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00PREMISES LIABILITY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.