Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allstate Vehicle And Prop, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Grotefeld Hoffmann Schlei, against Andrus Restoration Llc Db, Servpro Greater Covington, Servpro Industries Inc, represented by Miller Law Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryProperty Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: March 20, 2019RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: February 11, 2019FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: July 15, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: July 15, 2019ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: February 11, 2019FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00IMPOUND EXHIBITS OR DOCUMENTS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00PROPERTY DAMAGE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2019EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2019MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: May 10, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2019MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.