Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Doe Jane, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Loggans Susan E, against Little Eye'N Steins Early, Grooms Latoya, represented by Thompson Burks Cora, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: October 10, 2019FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: January 17, 2020MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/LEAVE TO REFILE-ALLOWED
Date: January 23, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00VACATE ANY OR ALL DEFAULT ORDERS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: January 16, 2020ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR FOCUSED CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: November 14, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: November 14, 2019DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: January 17, 2020ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: November 14, 2019CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: January 16, 2020MOTION TO VACATE NON-FINAL ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00ROUTINE MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00LEAVE TO FILE UNDER A FICTITIOUS NAME-ALLOWED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - PERSONAL SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00IMPOUND EXHIBITS OR DOCUMENTS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.