Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cincinnati Insurance Comp, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Grotefeld Hoffmann Schlei, against Larry?S Cartage Co., Inc., represented by Maisel & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryProperty Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
PROPERTY DAMAGE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: March 12, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: March 12, 2019RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: March 13, 2019STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: June 13, 2019ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: May 14, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: March 12, 2019VOLUNTARY MEDIATION WAS NOT UTILIZED IN REACHING THIS SETTLEMENT
Date: June 13, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: May 14, 2019COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: June 13, 2019NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.