Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raftie Herbert, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Levin & Perconti, against Pavilion Of Waukegan, Llc, Aa Healthcare Management,, represented by Culver John Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 24, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 20, 2020FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: March 11, 2020POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: March 24, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: June 19, 2020ANSWER TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: June 19, 2020POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: April 20, 2020EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: June 19, 2020CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 20, 2020CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00TRANSFER TO OTHER VENUE - OUTSIDE COOK COUNTY - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00DEFAULT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.