Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hemingway John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Injury Lawyers Pc Staver, against Williams Darryl, represented by Dorn Bruce Farrel & Ass, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Allen Price Walker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: July 08, 2019Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: September 12, 2019Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: August 21, 2019Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: August 21, 2019Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: August 21, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: August 21, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: August 21, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: August 21, 2019DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: September 12, 2019CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: July 08, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.