Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garrett Makayla Minor, Gayden Jeannette Mother N, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Malatesta Law Offices, against Board Education City Chic, Chicago Public Schools, E I Dupont Denemours, Kate Starr Kellogg Elemen, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Moira S. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryPremises Liabilty - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Premises Liability Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike, Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Continued -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike, Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Continued -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Hipaa Protective Order - Allowed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Governmental Agency To Be Billed
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: June 23, 2020Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Governmental Agency To Be Billed
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Dismissed For Want Of Prosecution
Date: October 28, 2022Motion Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: August 17, 2020Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: August 17, 2020Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: June 23, 2020Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed -
Date: January 09, 2023Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 23, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00AMENDED ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: June 23, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY TO BE BILLED
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY TO BE BILLED
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00PREMISES LIABILITY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Summons Served - Corporation/Company/Business
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Amended Answer Filed
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: June 23, 2020Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED - CORPORATION/COMPANY/BUSINESS
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.