Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Direct Auto Insurance Co., filed a(n) Declaratory Judgement case represented by Shelist & Pena Llc, against Morales Luis, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: March 04, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Date: March 04, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 29, 2020SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: February 05, 2020CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: January 29, 2020STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: March 04, 2020MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: February 05, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: February 05, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 02, 2020DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.