Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Homebridge Financial Serv, filed a(n) case represented by Heavner Beyers Mihlar Llc, against United States Of America, Hunt Tarlisa, represented by United St Atty Crim, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: December 31, 2019CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBITS FILED
Date: February 24, 2020CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: January 06, 2020CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: February 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: January 15, 2020OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: January 09, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: January 21, 2020STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: March 03, 2020APPEARANCE & VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - NO FEE
Date: February 24, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.