Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zazzara Rocco, filed a(n) General Chancery case represented by Langhenry Gillen Lundquis, against Illinois Department Of Pu, represented by Attorney Generals Office, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryGeneral Chancery |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: January 02, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 24, 2020GENERAL CHANCERY FILED
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 02, 2020CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00WAIVER FILED
Date: February 24, 2020ANSWER FILED
Date: February 24, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: February 24, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 30, 2020CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 30, 2020SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: January 02, 2020POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: June 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.