Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) case represented by Shapiro Kreisman Associat, against United States Of America, Pantoja Maria, Pantoja Gabriel, represented by United St Atty Crim, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: March 25, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: June 02, 2020OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: March 03, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: March 03, 2020CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00APPEARANCE & VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - NO FEE
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 25, 2020STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 17, 2020ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 25, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: March 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.