Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mell, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Nevel Ira T, against Green Tree Condominium As, Jamal Tasneem, United States Of America, represented by United St Atty Crim, Wator And Associates Pc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Freddrenna M. Lyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryOwner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
New Case Filing
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Letter Returned Filed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appearance&VerifiedAnswerToComplaintMortgageForeclosureNoFee
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Case Mgmt Call Notice Mailed
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order To Appoint Selling Officer - Allowed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice Of Default Order Mailed - Fee Required
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Affidavit For Service By Publication Filed
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Judg. Of Foreclosure & Sale(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Notice By Publication Filed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Default(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Appt. Selling Officer(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Receipt Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Notice Of Filing Of Proof Of Service Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Report Of Sale And Distribution
Date: December 23, 2021Mortgage Forclosure Disposed / Sheriffs Sale Approved
Date: January 21, 2022Order For Possession
Date: January 21, 2022Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Certificate Filed
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00APPEARANCE & VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - NO FEE
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.