Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nations Direct Mortgage,, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Yakubovskyy Vasyl, Unknown Owners And Nonrec, represented by Haderlein John A, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: April 21, 2020NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 09, 2020MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: April 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: April 21, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 02, 2020POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: June 02, 2020POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: March 20, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: March 09, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00APPEARANCE AND VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.