Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pnc Bank, National Associ, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Quintairos Prieto Wood &, against First Bank Of Highland Pa, Meltzer Jonathan, River North Commons Condo, Unknown Owners And Non-Re, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryOwner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: April 01, 2019Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: July 02, 2019Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Dismiss Entire Cause - Plaintiff -
Date: July 02, 2019Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Dismiss(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: July 01, 2019Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00DISMISS ENTIRE CAUSE - PLAINTIFF -
Date: July 02, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: July 01, 2019STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: April 01, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: July 01, 2019STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: July 02, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.