Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D, filed a(n) case represented by Manley Deas Kochalski Llc, against Chicago Title Land Trust, Fitch Cynthia, Fitch Steven, Unknown Owners And Non-Re, represented by Ernest B Fenton Pc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: September 30, 2019MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Date: January 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 21, 2019MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: June 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: October 02, 2019NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: March 16, 2020***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: May 21, 2020SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: October 21, 2019***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: March 26, 2020CLOSE DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: January 07, 2020***DISMISS PARTY(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00AMEND - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.