Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pnc Bank, National Associ, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners And Nonrec, Unknown Heirs And Legatee, Sunta Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: March 06, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: February 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: February 11, 2019OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: March 06, 2019CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: February 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: February 21, 2019STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: March 26, 2019***MISC.MOTION(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: March 07, 2019***FILE AMENDED PLEADING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: February 13, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.