Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rivera Lindabeth, Weiss Joseph, filed a(n) Class Actions case represented by Lite Depalma Greenberg Ll, against Google Llc, represented by Perkins Coie Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Loftus, Anna M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryClass Actions |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: April 14, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: August 18, 2023Preliminary Approval Order (Case is Pending) - Allowed
Date: April 25, 2022Answer/Response/Reply
Date: January 18, 2023MOTION FILED
Date: April 29, 2019Answer/Response/Reply
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: May 09, 2019MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - CONTINUED -
Date: May 16, 2019Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed -
Date: April 14, 2023Affidavit Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Answer/Response/Reply
Date: October 06, 2023Affidavit Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Intervene - Plaintiff - Allowed -
Date: April 14, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: October 06, 2023MOTION FILED
Date: May 22, 2019MOTION FILED
Date: June 10, 2019Continuance - Allowed -
Date: April 14, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: October 06, 2023MOTION FILED
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: May 08, 2019Miscellaneous Motion - Denied -
Date: April 14, 2023Class Action Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Motion To Appoint Special Process Server
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Certify Class(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Memorandum In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Memorandum In Support Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice Of Change Of Office Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Companion Case Designation - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Stay Of Execution
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Companion Case Designation - Allowed -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-31T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Lift Stay(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Letter Returned Filed
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Letter Returned Filed
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Companion Case Designation - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00File Amended Pleading(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Preliminary Approval Order (Case is Pending) - Continued
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Preliminary Approval Order (Case is Pending) - Continued
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Preliminary Approval Order (Case is Pending) - Continued
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Incoming Correspondence Filed
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Final Approval
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Court Retains Jurisdiction Over This Matter
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Order Final And Appealable
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Voluntary Dismissal, Non-Suit Or Dismissed By Agreement
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Continued -
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Intervene - Plaintiff - Continued -
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Intervening Petition Non-Party
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Intervene - Plaintiff - Continued -
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00Disburse Monies, Bonds Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-06-01T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2023-09-22T00:00:00Continued Generally - Allowed
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Order For Attorneys Fees - Continued -
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Order For Attorneys Fees - Continued -
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00Disburse Monies, Bonds Or Funds - Allowed -
Date: November 16, 2023Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: November 16, 2023Answer/Response/Reply
Date: October 13, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: October 13, 2023Affidavit Filed
Date: December 12, 2023Exhibits Filed
Date: October 13, 2023MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-31T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-31T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00STAY OF EXECUTION
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00COMPANION CASE DESIGNATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00BRIEF FILED
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00***CERTIFY CLASS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.