Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon T, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Love Leo, United States Of America, Unknown Owners And Nonrec, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with William B. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryNon-Owner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Non Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00AppointGuardianAdLitemTrustee AdministratorOrExecutor-Allwd
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Dismiss, Strike Or Withdraw A Specific Defendant - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00File Amendment Or Additional Or Amended Pleadings-Allowed
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Amendment To Additional Party Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Petition For Attorneys Fees
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Answer To Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Appearance And Verified AnswerToComplaintMortgageForeclosure
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Notice By Publication Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00AppointGuardianAdLitemTrustee AdministratorOrExecutor-Allwd
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Waiver Filed
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Appearance And Verified AnswerToComplaintMortgageForeclosure
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Default - Continued -
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Judg. Of Foreclosure & Sale(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Assigned to Remote Video Proceeding - Allowed
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00298 Defendant/Respondent- 100% - Granted/Allowed
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Judgment Of Foreclosure Entered (Case Is Pending)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Default - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Summary Judgment - Continued -
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous Motion - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Affidavit Filed
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order For Possession
Date: March 04, 2022Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Report Of Sale And Distribution
Date: January 28, 2022Certificate Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Mortgage Forclosure Disposed / Sheriffs Sale Approved
Date: March 04, 2022Notice Of Filing Of Proof Of Service Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Agreement to Participate in Remote Video Proceedings - Filed
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Default(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Certificate Of Publication Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00298 PETITION DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00298 PETITION FILED - DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00APPEARANCE AND VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO ADDITIONAL PARTY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TRUSTEE, ADMINISTRATOR OR EXECUTOR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00WAIVER FILED
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, TRUSTEE, ADMINISTRATOR OR EXECUTOR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00APPEARANCE AND VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NON OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.