Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon T, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Buchtel Forrest, United States Of America, Unknown Owners And Nonrec, represented by Center Disability & Elder, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Gerald V. Cleary, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryOwner Occupied Single-Family Home/Condo |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Dismiss(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Owner Occupied Single Family Home Or Condominium - Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Courts Motion This Case Is Taken Under Advisement
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Petition For Attorneys Fees
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: November 12, 2019Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Dismiss(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: December 03, 2019Objections Filed
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion Scheduled (Motion Counter Only)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: October 31, 2019Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Dismiss Entire Cause - Plaintiff -
Date: December 09, 2019Judg. Of Foreclosure & Sale(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion For Extension Of Time (Scr 323E) Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Dismiss Party(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Set Briefing Schedule - Allowed -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00COURTS MOTION THIS CASE IS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: October 29, 2019***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: December 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: October 31, 2019STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: November 12, 2019DISMISS ENTIRE CAUSE - PLAINTIFF -
Date: December 09, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00OBJECTIONS FILED
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00***DISMISS PARTY(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.