Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Seay Fka Debbie Nawcewicz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Latimer Levay Fyock Llc, against Baxter Credit Union, Germaine Celeste, Nawcewicz Jeffrey, Oliver Daralis, Oliver Gary, (total of 5) See All represented by Fehn Joanne F, Smith Amundsen Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Eve M. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryPartition |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion To Appoint Special Process Server
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Petition For Partition - Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-04-01T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: October 16, 2019Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Affidavit Of Service Filed
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Set On Case Management Call
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Substitution Of Attorney Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Summary Judgment(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Set On Status Call
Date: October 02, 2019Case Set On Status Call
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Agreed Order Entered
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-04-01T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Dismiss Entire Cause - Plaintiff -
Date: November 06, 2019Answer Filed
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Default(Set For Motion Hearing)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 30, 2019CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-04-01T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00DISMISS ENTIRE CAUSE - PLAINTIFF -
Date: November 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: September 30, 2019***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: September 30, 2019PETITION FOR PARTITION - FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: October 02, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.