Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners And Nonrec, Ruben Marcos Delgado, Mortgage Electronic Regis, Etelberto Camargo, City Of Chicago, (total of 7) See All represented by Heavner Beyers Mihlar Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
INCOMING CORRESPONDENCE FILED
Date: September 27, 2019DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: September 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: October 17, 2019AMOUNT DEPOSITED
Date: October 23, 2019MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: October 17, 2019MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00MOTION TO VACATE, MODIFY/REINSTATE FINAL ORDER/JUDGMENT > 30 DAYS
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: September 27, 2019JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00VACATE ANY OR ALL DEFAULT ORDERS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: September 27, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: September 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT ORDER MAILED - FEE PAID
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00ORDER SHORTENING REDEMPTION PERIOD - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: September 27, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.