Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards Eunice, filed a(n) case represented by Pro Se, against Hacc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: April 17, 2020ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: February 13, 2020ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: May 11, 2020FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: June 22, 2020CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: June 22, 2020FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: April 17, 2020FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: April 17, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00CERT. OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERV. PROVIDER FLD.
Date: May 11, 2020CERT. OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERV. PROVIDER FLD.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00CERT. OF REPRESENTATION BY CIVIL LEGAL SERV. PROVIDER FLD.
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: May 11, 2020APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00PETITION FOR CERTIORARI - FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00298 PETITION HEARING - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.