Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lafave June, Metropolitan Veterinary C, filed a(n) Injunction case represented by Jackson Llp, against Jacobs Kjerstin, represented by Pokorny Marks Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryInjunction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: December 23, 2019AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: January 06, 2020MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: December 23, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: December 23, 2019RULE TO SHOW CAUSE BE ISSUED - CONTINUED -
Date: November 19, 2019VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Date: January 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: December 23, 2019FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: November 19, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00RULE TO SHOW CAUSE BE ISSUED - ALLOWED -
Date: November 19, 2019CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: November 19, 2019ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00APPOINT RECEIVER - DENIED
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00***STRIKE PLEADING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00RULE TO SHOW CAUSE BE ISSUED - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00APPOINT RECEIVER - CONTINUED
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00DISBURSE MONIES, BONDS OR FUNDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00ORDER T.R.O. - DENIED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00AMEND ORDER OR DECREE - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00***TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PRE-TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00INJUNCTION COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00CONSOLIDATE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00ORDER T.R.O. - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00***TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.