Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fifth Third Bank As Succe, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners And Nonrec, United States Of America, Chicago Title Land Trust, Carroll Mary, represented by United St Atty Crim, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
NOTICE FILED
Date: March 26, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: March 19, 2019CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: March 15, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: April 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: March 21, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: September 25, 2019OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: March 15, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00***SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: March 26, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: April 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE & VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - NO FEE
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.