Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na., filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Webb Pearlie, Webb Kimberly, Unknown Owners And Nonrec, Rushing Willie, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: January 03, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: January 03, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: January 03, 2019STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: May 07, 2019LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: June 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: January 04, 2019EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-ALLOWED
Date: March 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Date: May 23, 2019***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: May 22, 2019NOTICE FILED
Date: January 09, 2019OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.