Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Nati, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners And Nonrec, Engel Sally, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
EXHIBITS FILED
Date: January 03, 2019CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: October 01, 2019CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE FILED
Date: January 15, 2019CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT
Date: January 22, 2019STRICKEN FROM CALL, ORDER CASE DISPOSED FROM PREVIOUS FINAL ORDER
Date: November 19, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: January 22, 2019CASE MGMT CALL NOTICE MAILED
Date: October 08, 2019OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: January 22, 2019***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: January 22, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.