Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grande Evelyn P, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rivera Paolo P, against Madulara Nestor S, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with RIVERA ELIZABETH L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2019CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: February 25, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: January 22, 2019CERTIFICATE & MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED
Date: February 25, 2019PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: March 18, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: April 22, 2019CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: March 18, 2019CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: January 31, 2019ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.