Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Prokuski Timothy, Timothy Prokuski, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jonathan Merel Pc, against Ning Prokuski, Prokuski Ning, represented by Beermann Pritikin Mirabel, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with ARCE, EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Order Leave To File Petition For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Counter Petition Filed
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Order of Court Continuance COVID-19 Closure
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Set On Assignment/Trial Call
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order Leave To File Petition For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order Leave To File Petition For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Strike Future Court Date
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities Judgment Pet/Resp - Allowed
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Trial Section
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Case Set On Pre-Trial Call
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Case Set On Pre-Trial Call
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-31T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Case Set On Pre-Trial Call
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-03-31T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Rule To Issue And Returnable
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Res) - Allowed -
Date: March 05, 2024Order Leave To File -Report Of Proceedings Within 28 Days - Allowed -
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2024-01-30T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: April 15, 2024Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2024-01-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Order For Attorney Fees - Allowed -
Date: April 15, 2024Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Petition For Issuance Of Rule (To Show Cause) Filed
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00Rule To Show Cause Be Issued - Allowed -
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: March 05, 2024DR2832
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00DR4801
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid -
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2023-10-25T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2023-11-29T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition - Allowed -
Date: March 05, 2024File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: March 05, 2024Notice Filed
Date: 2024-02-01T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Action Involves Minor Child/Children
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Marriage
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Motion For Special Process Server
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Appoint Special Deputy - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Order Entered
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Order Referral Marriage & Family Counseling Services - Allowed -
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Petitioner Referred To Parenting Education - Allowed
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Respondent Referred To Parenting Education - Allowed
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Set On Mediation Call
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Focus On Children
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Substitution And/Or Withdrawal Of Attorney Filed
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Substitution And/Or Withdrawal Of Attorney Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Petition For Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Cause Continued For Hearing (Res) - Allowed -
Date: March 15, 2024Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: March 15, 2024File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: March 15, 2024Order Plaintiff Leave To File Petition - Allowed -
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00ORDER OF COURT CONTINUANCE COVID-19 CLOSURE
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00COUNTER PETITION FILED
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00PETITIONER REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00FOCUS ON CHILDREN
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00ORDER REFERRAL MARRIAGE & FAMILY COUNSELING SERVICES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00RESPONDENT REFERRED TO PARENTING EDUCATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00CASE SET ON MEDIATION CALL
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION AND/OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00MOTION FOR SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.