Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mims Creighton, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zimmerman Law Offices Pc, against Coach Leasing Inc, Coach Usa Inc, Flowers Randall, Megabus Southeast Llc, Megabus Usa Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Pretzel & Stouffer, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Nancy J. Arnold presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy J. Arnold Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: September 29, 2017COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: October 24, 2017STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: November 08, 2017SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: September 29, 2017REFILE AS NEW CASE
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: October 24, 2017STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: September 29, 2017TRANSFERRED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: September 29, 2017MOTION FILED
Date: September 29, 2017CASE RERANDOMIZED TO MOTION CALL
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: September 29, 2017FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00VOLUNTARY MEDIATION WAS NOT UTILIZED IN REACHING THIS SETTLEMENT
Date: October 24, 2017EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.