Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bryant Sr James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Thomas Nekisha, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Sharon O. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORDER WAIVER OF MAINTENANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: January 23, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2017PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: December 30, 2016ORDER CAUSE ASSIGNED FOR PROVE-UP IN DIST. 6 CAL H
Date: January 23, 2017ORDER TO CHANGE NAME
Date: January 23, 2017CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: January 23, 2017CERTIFY TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDS - ALLOWED -
Date: February 07, 2017STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE IN DISTRICT 6
Date: December 30, 2016PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: January 23, 2017SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: January 13, 2017MARRIAGE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.