Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cruz Oscar L, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Day Paul R, against Arellano Veronica, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPet To Establish Parentage (Non-Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePaternity |
MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00PET TO ESTABLISH PARENTAGE (NON IV-D)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON DEFAULT CALL
Date: January 11, 2017EXHIBITS FILED
Date: January 27, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00CASE IS OFF CALL
Date: February 08, 2017FINDING OF PARENTAGE - ALLOWED -
Date: February 08, 2017EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00ORDER TO CHANGE NAME
Date: February 08, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: January 27, 2017APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: January 20, 2017PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED A PARENTAGE PETITION
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: January 27, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 10, 2017SUMMONS - RETD P.S.
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.