Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Odonoghue Jacqueline, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Davis Gabrielle S, against Odonoghue Dennis, represented by Kollias & Giese Pc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Carole K. Bellows presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: April 07, 2017NOTICE FILED
Date: April 03, 2017APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: March 29, 2017CAUSE ASSIGNED FOR PROVE-UP
Date: April 07, 2017REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: May 19, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION SENT
Date: April 07, 2017COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00RESTRICTED BY RULE 138
Date: April 07, 2017MARRIAGE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED VIA TELEPHONE
Date: March 29, 2017ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: April 07, 2017CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: April 07, 2017PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.