Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gayton Lupe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Hickey David W, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Helaine L. Berger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2016 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: June 28, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: June 28, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: July 14, 2016APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: June 28, 2016CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: July 14, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: July 14, 2016ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: August 16, 2016STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: July 07, 2016STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: July 07, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: July 07, 2016298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.