Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lazano Jose A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Martinez Maria S, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Helaine L. Berger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2016 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORDER ON MOTION TO PROVIDE MEDICAL INSURANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 06, 2016REPORT OR RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS FILED
Date: July 28, 2016COMPLETION OF MINOR CHILDREN PARENTING EDUCATION/ RESPONDENT - FILED -
Date: June 06, 2016CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00SCHEDULED DATE
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: June 06, 2016STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: June 06, 2016ACTION INVOLVES MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00ORDER SUPPORT PAYMENTS MADE DIRECT TO RESPONDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: June 06, 2016ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES JUDGMENT PET/RESP - ALLOWED
Date: June 06, 2016RESTRICTED BY RULE 138
Date: June 06, 2016MARRIAGE
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00STIPULATION TO HEAR UNCONTESTED CAUSE FILED
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT - ALLOWED -
Date: June 06, 2016COMPLETION OF MINOR CHILDREN PARENTING EDUCATION/ PETITIONER - FILED -
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION SENT
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00ORDER LEAVE TO FILE -REPORT OF PROCEEDINGS WITHIN 28 DAYS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: June 22, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.