Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales Evangelina, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by O'Toole John M, against Trust 17146 Standard Bank, Getto Joseph, represented by Dorn Bruce Farrel & Ass, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Larry G. Axelrood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryProperty Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: July 20, 2017DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2017EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00THIS SETTLEMENT WAS REACHED AS A RESULT OF VOLUNTARY MEDIATION
Date: November 28, 2017CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: August 31, 2017FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2017ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: October 16, 2017MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF ANSWER FILED
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FOR SERVICE BY POSTING
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER
Date: November 28, 2017CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00TRIAL LAWYER APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: November 28, 2017CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 16, 2017ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: June 21, 2017FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00VACATE ANY OR ALL DEFAULT ORDERS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00PROPERTY DAMAGE COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.