Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prince Eustace, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kryder Andrew S, against Smith Erica, represented by Christopher R Bruneau, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with William E. Gomolinski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury(Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: September 25, 2017TRANSFER CASE TO PRESIDING JUDGE WITHIN DISTRICT/DIVISION
Date: December 01, 2017CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00MOTION TO VACATE, MODIFY/REINSTATE FINAL ORDER/JUDGMENT < OR = 30 DAYS
Date: September 25, 2017STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: September 25, 2017EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: September 25, 2017DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: October 06, 2017CASE RERANDOMIZED TO MOTION CALL
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00VACATE ANY OR ALL DEFAULT ORDERS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00SOJ (AS OF RIGHT) - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00ORDER CAUSE RE-ASSIGNED MOTION CALENDAR
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: September 25, 2017MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 06, 2017TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00CASE RETURNED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT WITH A TRIAL DATE
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00REINSTATE CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: October 06, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00ORDER CASE TRANSFERRED FOR TRIAL TO MUNICIPAL DEPARTMENT, 1ST DISTRICT
Date: December 04, 2017DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00SERVICE BY SPECIAL ORDER OF COURT - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON PROVE UP CALL
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00NOTICE TO PRODUCE FILED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER FILED
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00MOTION TO VACATE - FILED
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.