Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ramos Ignacua Madrigal, Rangel Gerardo Espino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cary J Wintroub & Associa, against All State Relocation Se, Arfaoui Ramzi, represented by Tressler Llp, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with James P. Flannery, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Personal Injury (Motor Vehicle) Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Date Generated
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Answer To Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Order Case Transferred For Trial To Municipal Dept, 1st Dist
Date: March 07, 2017Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Case Electronically Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Affirmative Defense Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Transfer Case To Presiding Judge Within District/Division
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Answer To Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00PERSONAL INJURY (MOTOR VEHICLE) COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00ORDER CASE TRANSFERRED FOR TRIAL TO MUNICIPAL DEPARTMENT, 1ST DISTRICT
Date: March 07, 2017MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: September 21, 2017EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00TRANSFER CASE TO PRESIDING JUDGE WITHIN DISTRICT/DIVISION
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: September 21, 2017NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: September 21, 2017AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: September 21, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.