We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Ellingsen Ronald H Vs Dentist Profits Inc

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Ellingsen Ronald H, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Reed Smith Llp, against Dentist Profits Inc, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .

Case Details for Ellingsen Ronald H v. Dentist Profits Inc

Filing Date

April 30, 2015

Category

Petition To Register Foreign Judgment

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Matter Type

Judgment Enforcement

Parties for Ellingsen Ronald H v. Dentist Profits Inc

Plaintiffs

Ellingsen Ronald H

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Reed Smith Llp

Defendants

Dentist Profits Inc

Case Documents for Ellingsen Ronald H v. Dentist Profits Inc

CITATION TO DISCOVER ASSETS ISSUED

Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: September 14, 2015

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: September 14, 2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00

MOTION SCHEDULED

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

MOTION SCHEDULED

Date: September 14, 2015

MOTION SCHEDULED

Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00

LETTER RETURNED FILED

Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00

ORDER CASE DISPOSED

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00

Case Events for Ellingsen Ronald H v. Dentist Profits Inc

Type Description
Docket Event ATTACHMENT TO ISSUE AND RETURNABLE

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event SET BOND OR BAIL AMOUNT - ALLOWED -

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT - ALLOWED -

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
Docket Event MOTION SCHEDULED
Docket Event PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event RULE TO ISSUE AND RETURNABLE

Judge: WHITE, ALEXANDER P

Docket Event CITATION TO DISCOVER ASSETS - RETD P.S.
See all events